TX HR1176 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Muenster High School boys' basketball team on winning the 2017 UIL 2A state championship.
Title
Congratulating the Muenster High School boys' basketball team on winning the 2017 UIL 2A state championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-28 | House | Filed |