TX HR1211 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Sharon Rogers on her selection as the 2012 Woman of the Year by the Brazosport Area Chamber of Commerce.
Title
Congratulating Sharon Rogers on her selection as the 2012 Woman of the Year by the Brazosport Area Chamber of Commerce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-17 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed |