TX HR1699 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Recognizing the Texas A&M University Agricultural and Natural Resources Policy Internship Program and Public Policy Internship Program and the interns for the 81st legislative session.
Title
Recognizing the Texas A&M University Agricultural and Natural Resources Policy Internship Program and Public Policy Internship Program and the interns for the 81st legislative session.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Brown [R] | Rep. Warren Chisum [R] | Rep. Dan Gattis [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Rep. Jerry Madden [R] | Rep. John Otto [R] | Rep. Todd Smith [R] | Rep. John Smithee [R] |
Rep. David Swinford [R] | Rep. Vicki Truitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-07 | Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-29 | Filed |