TX HR1785 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Recognizing Andy Burnett for his distinguished military service.
Title
Recognizing Andy Burnett for his distinguished military service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-07 | Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-04 | Filed |