TX HR2246 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Summary
In memory of Mary Jane Krueger of Bellville.
Title
In memory of Mary Jane Krueger of Bellville.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-25 | Adopted | |
2009-05-25 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-19 | Filed |