TX HR2260 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Harris County Precinct One Community Emergency Response Team.
Title
Honoring the Harris County Precinct One Community Emergency Response Team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HARRIS COUNTY PRECINCT ONE COMMUNITY EMERGENCY RESPONSE TEAM
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary