TX HR265 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-20 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-20 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Recognizing March 18, 2009, as Leadership Killeen Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 18, 2009, as Leadership Killeen Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-18 | Adopted | |
2009-03-18 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |
Subjects
LEADERSHIP KILLEEN DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates