TX HR265 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Ben Galvan on being named the 2018 Outstanding Chamber Member of the Year by the Victoria Chamber of Commerce.
Title
Congratulating Ben Galvan on being named the 2018 Outstanding Chamber Member of the Year by the Victoria Chamber of Commerce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-13 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed |