TX HR265 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Alicia Roth Weigel for her service to the LGBTQIA+ communities of Texas.
Title
Commending Alicia Roth Weigel for her service to the LGBTQIA+ communities of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-18 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-10-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-15 | House | Filed |