TX HR94 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Stephanie Goodman on her retirement as deputy commissioner for public affairs with the Texas Department of Insurance.
Title
Congratulating Stephanie Goodman on her retirement as deputy commissioner for public affairs with the Texas Department of Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-13 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-11 | House | Filed |