TX HR962 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating The University of Texas at Dallas chess team on winning the 2023 Southwest Collegiate Team Championship.
Title
Congratulating The University of Texas at Dallas chess team on winning the 2023 Southwest Collegiate Team Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-20 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Filed |