TX HR988 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating Texas Deposition Reporting Day at the State Capitol on April 18, 2023.
Title
Commemorating Texas Deposition Reporting Day at the State Capitol on April 18, 2023.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-20 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DEPOSITION REPORTING DAY, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates