TX SB1110 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on Major State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on Major State Calendar
Summary
Relating to contracts by governmental entities and related professional services and to public works performance and payment bonds.
Title
Relating to contracts by governmental entities and related professional services and to public works performance and payment bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-16 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Passed | |
2009-04-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-16 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-02 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-24 | Filed | |
2009-02-24 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2106 (Same As) 2009-03-09 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
City Government
City Government--General
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
County Government
County Government--General
DESIGN-BUILD CONTRACTS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--School Districts
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
City Government
City Government--General
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
County Government
County Government--General
DESIGN-BUILD CONTRACTS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--School Districts
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions