TX SB1123 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Summary
Relating to the standard of causation in claims involving mesothelioma caused by exposure to asbestos fibers.
Title
Relating to the standard of causation in claims involving mesothelioma caused by exposure to asbestos fibers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-22 | Read first time | |
2009-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-20 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-20 | Record vote | |
2009-04-20 | Passed as amended | |
2009-04-20 | Record vote | |
2009-04-20 | Amended | |
2009-04-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-20 | Record vote | |
2009-04-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-25 | Filed | |
2009-02-25 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1811 (Same As) 2009-03-30 - Left pending in committee