TX SB1171 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the electronic administration of certain required assessment instruments, measures to support Internet connectivity for purposes of those assessment instruments, and the adoption and administration of certain optional interim assessment instruments.
Title
Relating to the electronic administration of certain required assessment instruments, measures to support Internet connectivity for purposes of those assessment instruments, and the adoption and administration of certain optional interim assessment instruments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3261 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET