TX SB1419 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to this state's goal for renewable energy.
Title
Relating to this state's goal for renewable energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed | |
2009-03-06 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3478 (Same As) 2009-04-07 - Left pending in committee