TX SB1466 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to the procurement of certain cement by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to the procurement of certain cement by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Wendy Davis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-25 | Rereferred to committee | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed | |
2009-03-06 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2175 (Same As) 2009-03-09 - Referred to Transportation