TX SB1466 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Vehicle and Watercraft Crime Prevention Authority and to the creation of the vehicle and watercraft crime prevention account.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Vehicle and Watercraft Crime Prevention Authority and to the creation of the vehicle and watercraft crime prevention account.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-27 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUTOMOBILE BURGLARY & THEFT PREVENTION AUTHORITY
BOATS & BOATING
BURGLARY
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
VEHICLE & WATERCRAFT CRIME PREVENTION AUTHORITY
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
BOATS & BOATING
BURGLARY
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
VEHICLE & WATERCRAFT CRIME PREVENTION AUTHORITY
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SB1466 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SB01466I.htm |