TX SB1466 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the state salary for retired judges.
Title
Relating to the state salary for retired judges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3951 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--District
Courts--Judges
Courts--Justice
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Salaries & Expenses
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Courts--Appellate
Courts--District
Courts--Judges
Courts--Justice
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Salaries & Expenses
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1466 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01466I.htm |