TX SB156 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation and management of the use of groundwater and regulation of groundwater conservation districts.
Title
Relating to the regulation and management of the use of groundwater and regulation of groundwater conservation districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
PERMITS
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility