TX SB1561 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to developing a developmental education plan for students entering public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to developing a developmental education plan for students entering public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-29 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed | |
2009-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3791 (Same As) 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS