TX SB1566 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the acquisition, dissemination, and use of certain geographic information system data.
Title
Relating to the acquisition, dissemination, and use of certain geographic information system data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-14 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-05 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Amended | |
2009-05-05 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-05 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed | |
2009-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BORDER
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Electronic Information Systems
GEOGRAPHIC INFORMATION COUNCIL, TEXAS
NATURAL RESOURCES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Electronic Information Systems
GEOGRAPHIC INFORMATION COUNCIL, TEXAS
NATURAL RESOURCES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions