TX SB1593 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training by the Texas Department of Transportation on the recognition and prevention of smuggling and trafficking of persons.
Title
Relating to training by the Texas Department of Transportation on the recognition and prevention of smuggling and trafficking of persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1608 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-05-08 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4472 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
State Employees
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
State Employees
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF