TX SB1605 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing an optional county fee on vehicle registration in certain counties for transportation projects.
Title
Relating to authorizing an optional county fee on vehicle registration in certain counties for transportation projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BORDER
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
MEXICO
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
UNITED MEXICAN STATES
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
MEXICO
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
UNITED MEXICAN STATES