TX SB1659 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Summary
Relating to the use of hazardous and solid waste remediation fee funds for lead-acid battery recycling activities.
Title
Relating to the use of hazardous and solid waste remediation fee funds for lead-acid battery recycling activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-17 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3765 (Same As) 2009-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Recycling
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HAZARDOUS SUBSTANCES
Environment--Recycling
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HAZARDOUS SUBSTANCES