TX SB177 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a petition filed for a place on the ballot as a candidate for the board of directors of the Wilbarger County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to a petition filed for a place on the ballot as a candidate for the board of directors of the Wilbarger County Hospital District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2888 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
WILBARGER COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
WILBARGER COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT