TX SB18 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to distributing or prescribing abortion-inducing drugs; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to distributing or prescribing abortion-inducing drugs; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Filed |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |