TX SB18 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to measures to support or enhance graduate medical education in this state, including the transfer of certain assets from the Texas Medical Liability Insurance Underwriting Association to the permanent fund supporting graduate medical education and the authority of the association to issue new policies.
Title
Relating to measures to support or enhance graduate medical education in this state, including the transfer of certain assets from the Texas Medical Liability Insurance Underwriting Association to the permanent fund supporting graduate medical education and the authority of the association to issue new policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - SB 18Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-03 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-05-21 | House | Amended |
2015-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-28 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-04-27 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--General
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Property & Casualty
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
TREASURY SAFEKEEPING TRUST COMPANY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--General
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Property & Casualty
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
TREASURY SAFEKEEPING TRUST COMPANY, TEXAS