TX SB1877 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the development and maintenance by each state agency of a data use agreement for the state agency's employees and to training related to that agreement.
Title
Relating to the development and maintenance by each state agency of a data use agreement for the state agency's employees and to training related to that agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - SB 1877Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed |
2015-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2015-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
Science & Technology
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
Science & Technology
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees