TX SB1936 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of specially marked driver's licenses and personal identification certificates to disabled veterans.
Title
Relating to the issuance of specially marked driver's licenses and personal identification certificates to disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
Military & Veterans
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
Military & Veterans
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS