TX SB1945 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Uniform Trade Secrets Act.
Title
Relating to the Texas Uniform Trade Secrets Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
TEXAS UNIFORM TRADE SECRETS ACT
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
TEXAS UNIFORM TRADE SECRETS ACT