TX SB2044 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of recycling and recycled products.
Title
Relating to the regulation of recycling and recycled products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3060 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective immediately
HB3060 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective immediately
HB3060 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective immediately
Subjects
BURNING & INCINERATORS
Environment
Environment--Air
Environment--Recycling
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Environment
Environment--Air
Environment--Recycling
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON