TX SB205 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the Texas Partnership for Children in Nature.
Title
Relating to the Texas Partnership for Children in Nature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-01 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3271 (Same As) 2009-03-18 - Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
Subjects
Agriculture
CHILDREN IN NATURE, TEXAS PARTNERSHIP
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Environment
Environment--General
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Health
Health--General
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--General
CHILDREN IN NATURE, TEXAS PARTNERSHIP
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Environment
Environment--General
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Health
Health--General
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--General