TX SB2121 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the persons entitled to redeem property after the foreclosure of a property owners' association's assessment lien.
Title
Relating to the persons entitled to redeem property after the foreclosure of a property owners' association's assessment lien.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk England [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-08 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2392 (Similar To) 2009-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
FORECLOSURES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Property Owners Association