TX SB2153 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 251; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 251; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
FORT BEND COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 251
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
FORT BEND COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 251
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2153 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02153I.htm |