TX SB2180 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers of a public utility agency; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments.
Title
Relating to the powers of a public utility agency; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2701 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Left pending in committee
HB2701 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Left pending in committee
HB2701 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB2180 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB02180I.htm |