TX SB219 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of health and human services in this state, including the powers and duties of the Health and Human Services Commission and other state agencies, and the licensing of certain health professionals; clarifying certain statutory provisions; authorizing the imposition of fees.
Title
Relating to the provision of health and human services in this state, including the powers and duties of the Health and Human Services Commission and other state agencies, and the licensing of certain health professionals; clarifying certain statutory provisions; authorizing the imposition of fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Effective immediately | |
2015-04-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-03-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-03-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-30 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-03-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed |
2015-03-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-03-26 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-26 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
Aging
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
ASSISTIVE & REHABILITATIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
BORDER HEALTH, OFFICE OF
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CORRECTIONAL OFFICE ON OFFENDERS WITH MEDICAL OR MENTAL IMPAIRMENTS
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Disabilities, Persons with
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HEALTH COORDINATION & CONSUMER SERVICES, OFFICE OF
Health--Children's Insurance
Health--General
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
MEDICAID
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Aging
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
ASSISTIVE & REHABILITATIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
BORDER HEALTH, OFFICE OF
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CORRECTIONAL OFFICE ON OFFENDERS WITH MEDICAL OR MENTAL IMPAIRMENTS
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Disabilities, Persons with
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HEALTH COORDINATION & CONSUMER SERVICES, OFFICE OF
Health--Children's Insurance
Health--General
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
MEDICAID
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS