TX SB219 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to civil liability and responsibility for the consequences of defects in the plans, specifications, or related documents for the construction or repair of an improvement to real property or of a road or highway.
Title
Relating to civil liability and responsibility for the consequences of defects in the plans, specifications, or related documents for the construction or repair of an improvement to real property or of a road or highway.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] | Rep. Lacey Hull [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1015 (Y: 113 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1015 (Y: 113 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-18 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1015 |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-12 | House | Amended 1-Leach |
2021-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion CSHB 1418 |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-04-13 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Johnson |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-30 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1418 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
ARCHITECTS & ARCHITECTURE
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
CONSTRUCTION & BUILDING MATERIALS
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
DESIGN-BUILD CONTRACTS
ENGINEERS & ENGINEERING
Oil & Gas
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Telecommunications
Utilities--Water & Sewer
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
CONSTRUCTION & BUILDING MATERIALS
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
DESIGN-BUILD CONTRACTS
ENGINEERS & ENGINEERING
Oil & Gas
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Telecommunications
Utilities--Water & Sewer