TX SB2207 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Summary
Relating to retirement qualifications for appellate judges.
Title
Relating to retirement qualifications for appellate judges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-21 | Read first time | |
2009-05-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Passed | |
2009-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Amended | |
2009-05-19 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-19 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-11 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-11 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2207 (Same As) 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar