TX SB2334 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to grants for disaster response by nonprofit food banks.
Title
Relating to grants for disaster response by nonprofit food banks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3668 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
FOOD
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Governor
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
FOOD
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Governor
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control