TX SB235 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to propose a fire control, prevention, and emergency medical services district.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to propose a fire control, prevention, and emergency medical services district.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#413 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#413 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#413 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-04-15 | House | Amended 1-Springer |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 747 |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Filed |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB747 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
NORTH CENTRAL TEXAS COLLEGE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
City Government--General
NORTH CENTRAL TEXAS COLLEGE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous