TX SB238 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation by a property owners' association of the installation of solar energy devices on property.
Title
Relating to the regulation by a property owners' association of the installation of solar energy devices on property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-10 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-10 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-31 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-31 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-31 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-07 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-23 | Filed | |
2010-11-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Energy
Energy--Solar
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property
RESTRICTIVE COVENANTS
Energy--Solar
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property
RESTRICTIVE COVENANTS