TX SB2483 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of an Education Savings Account program.
Title
Relating to the establishment of an Education Savings Account program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
PARENT EMPOWERMENT ACT
PARENTAL RIGHTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
PARENT EMPOWERMENT ACT
PARENTAL RIGHTS