TX SB254 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the extension of consumer credit to certain members of the Texas National Guard and armed forces of the United States and their dependents; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to the extension of consumer credit to certain members of the Texas National Guard and armed forces of the United States and their dependents; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-02-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-02-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-12-10 | Filed | |
2010-12-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SB254 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SB00254I.htm |