TX SB415 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the entry of a plea by defendants charged with certain misdemeanors involving family violence.
Title
Relating to the entry of a plea by defendants charged with certain misdemeanors involving family violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2896 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee