TX SB415 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to use of electric energy storage facilities in the ERCOT power region.
Title
Relating to use of electric energy storage facilities in the ERCOT power region.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1540 (Y: 131 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1540 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-14 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1672 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - Considered in Calendars
HB2818 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs
HB2818 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric