TX SB426 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the liability of and payment of legal fees for court-appointed trustees of certain facilities.
Title
Relating to the liability of and payment of legal fees for court-appointed trustees of certain facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-10 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-10 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Human Services | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-03-17 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-17 | Record vote | |
2011-03-17 | Passed | |
2011-03-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-17 | Record vote | |
2011-03-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time | |
2011-01-27 | Filed | |
2011-01-27 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Disabilities, Persons with
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Indigent Health Care
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
Nursing Homes
Disabilities, Persons with
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Indigent Health Care
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
Nursing Homes