TX SB498 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to building code requirements for residential property insured by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.
Title
Relating to building code requirements for residential property insured by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - House - SB 498Third Reading House (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Effective immediately | |
2015-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-19 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-18 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-18 | House | Passed |
2015-05-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-22 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |