TX SB614 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Finance Commission of Texas, the Texas Department of Banking, and the Department of Savings and Mortgage Lending, to the training requirements applicable to the agencies overseen by the Finance Commission of Texas, and to the regulation of certain financial institutions and businesses.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Finance Commission of Texas, the Texas Department of Banking, and the Department of Savings and Mortgage Lending, to the training requirements applicable to the agencies overseen by the Finance Commission of Texas, and to the regulation of certain financial institutions and businesses.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#757 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#757 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-04-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1569 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
BANKING, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Courts
Courts--District
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--Banks
Financial--General
Financial--Savings & Loans
SAVINGS & MORTGAGE LENDING, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Courts
Courts--District
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--Banks
Financial--General
Financial--Savings & Loans
SAVINGS & MORTGAGE LENDING, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills