TX SB69 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to child protective services and foster care.
Title
Relating to child protective services and foster care.
Sponsors
Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Rep. Patrick Rose [D] |
Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-06 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Amended | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Amended | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-02 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-02 | Postponed | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Amended | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-02 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-11 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services